OK SB133 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB133
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher pay; salary schedule. Coditional effective date. Emergency.
Title
Teacher pay; salary schedule. Coditional effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David, Thompson, Fields, Schulz, Bice, Pemberton, Dugger, Sharp, Griffin, Quinn, Fry, Treat, McCortney, Simpson, Yen, Stanislawski, Leewright, Pederson, Bergstrom |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Silk |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB133 (Carry Over) 2017-02-22 - Emergency clause stricken