OK SB130 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor 04/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor 04/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties, financial and performance audits; County Budget Act, establishment and maintenance of county records. Emergency.
Title
Counties, financial and performance audits; County Budget Act, establishment and maintenance of county records. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor 04/06/2011 | |
2011-03-31 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-03-30 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-03-30 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-30 | General Order | |
2011-03-28 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2011-03-08 | First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-24 | coauthored by Johnson (principal House author) | |
2011-02-24 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Reynolds | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |