OK SB1274 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Abortion; creating the Heartbeat Informed Consent Act. Effective date.
Title
Abortion; creating the Heartbeat Informed Consent Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Approved by Governor 04/27/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-23 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-23 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-19 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 12 | |
2012-04-19 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Kern, Cockroft, Brumbaugh, Faught, McCullough, Hall | |
2012-04-19 | General Order | |
2012-03-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Christian, Ritze | |
2012-03-28 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8 | |
2012-03-06 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2012-03-06 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2012-02-06 | coauthored by Peterson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Newberry | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 745 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 745 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |