OK SB1232 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Oil and gas; modifying method of calculation for certain interest on proceeds; modifying requirements of division and transfer orders. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas; modifying method of calculation for certain interest on proceeds; modifying requirements of division and transfer orders. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-20SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-02-12SenateWithdrawn from Energy committee
2020-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Daniels
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback