OK SB1219 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
Pending: House Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
Pending: House Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; modifying requirements for edible medical marijuana products. Effective date.
Title
Medical marijuana; modifying requirements for edible medical marijuana products. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2022-03-24 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bullard |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |