OK SB1211 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child care licensing; requiring use of certain subcommittees; specifying composition of certain Board. Effective date.
Title
Child care licensing; requiring use of certain subcommittees; specifying composition of certain Board. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. Katie Henke [R] |
Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 57 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: EXTEND DEBATE (Y: 18 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [FAIL]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 57 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: EXTEND DEBATE (Y: 18 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [FAIL]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-26 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-26 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 7 |
2016-05-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft |
2016-05-26 | House | Remove Representative Cockroft as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2016-05-26 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2016-05-26 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2016-05-23 | Senate | coauthored by Dossett |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2016-05-16 | Senate | coauthored by Floyd |
2016-05-02 | Senate | SCs named Griffin, Simpson, Pittman, Standridge, Treat, Loveless, Floyd |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Children, Youth, and Family Services |
2016-04-27 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2016-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-21 | House | Motion expired |
2016-04-19 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Cockroft |
2016-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1 |
2016-04-19 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-04-19 | House | Title stricken |
2016-04-19 | House | Ayes: 42 Nays: 23 |
2016-04-19 | House | Amended |
2016-04-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Henke, Roberts (Sean) |
2016-04-19 | House | General Order |
2016-03-22 | House | Title restored |
2016-03-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2016-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Munson |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Cockroft (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |