OK SB1201 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Memorial highway designations; designating Specialist Micheal Phillips Memorial Highway. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Memorial highway designations; designating Specialist Micheal Phillips Memorial Highway. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-22 | coauthored by Ownbey (principal House author) | |
2012-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Simpson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |