OK SB1178 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prison and reformatories; authorizing the expansion of certain inmate education program. Effective date.
Title
Prison and reformatories; authorizing the expansion of certain inmate education program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garvin |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |