OK SB114 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB114
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans; repealing priority applications at the Oklahoma Veterans Home. creation of the Agent Orange Outreach Commission; creation of the Gulf War Syndrome Outreach Commission. Effective date.
Title
Veterans; repealing priority applications at the Oklahoma Veterans Home. creation of the Agent Orange Outreach Commission; creation of the Gulf War Syndrome Outreach Commission. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-22 | House | General Order |
2021-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB114 (Carry Over) 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021