OK SB114 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; authorizing state agencies to provide change of address information to State Election Board. Effective date.
Title
Elections; authorizing state agencies to provide change of address information to State Election Board. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 73 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/04/2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-19 | House | To Senate |
2015-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 10 |
2015-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2015-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2015-05-15 | Senate | CCR read |
2015-05-11 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics |
2015-04-29 | Senate | SCs named Stanislawski, Justice, Holt, Griffin, Bice, Matthews, Wyrick |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2015-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-16 | House | Motion expired |
2015-04-14 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Shelton |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 20 |
2015-04-14 | House | General Order |
2015-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-03-02 | Senate | coauthored by Newberry |
2015-03-02 | Senate | coauthored by Walker (principal House author) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 4 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 4 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 4 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 7 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text |