OK SB1127 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Measure failed: Ayes: 12 Nays: 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Measure failed: Ayes: 12 Nays: 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Nursing Practice Act; modifying definition. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Nursing Practice Act; modifying definition. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ervin Yen [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 12 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 12 Nays: 32 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Cockroft (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yen |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |