OK SB1105 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Uniform Commercial Code; creating the Uniform Certificate of Title Act. Effective date.
Title
Uniform Commercial Code; creating the Uniform Certificate of Title Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-04-06 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-06 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-26 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 | |
2010-05-26 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-25 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-25 | Title restored | |
2010-05-25 | CCR read | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, HC's named Morrissette, Kiesel, Inman, Morgan, Sullivan, Duncan, Trebilcock, Johnson, Jordan | |
2009-04-30 | SCs named Anderson, Mazzei, Lamb, Ivester, Coffee | |
2009-04-22 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-04-15 | HAs read | |
2009-04-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 | |
2009-04-14 | General Order | |
2009-04-07 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-07 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Ivester | |
2009-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-03-09 | First Reading | |
2009-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-24 | coauthored by Morrissette (principal House author) | |
2009-02-24 | coauthored by Mazzei | |
2009-02-24 | Remove as author Senator Mazzei; authored by Senator Anderson | |
2009-02-24 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-24 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-23 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Morrissette | |
2009-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-09 | Pending removal author Senator Mazzei and replace with Senator Anderson | |
2009-02-09 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Mazzei | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Business and Economic Development
Motor Vehicles and Transportation
Popular Name Laws
Revenue and Taxation
Motor Vehicles and Transportation
Popular Name Laws
Revenue and Taxation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12A | 1 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1105 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 1106 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 1107 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 1107 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1110 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 1111 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1111 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |