OK SB1074 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Construction Industries Board; extending sunset date. Effective date.
Title
Construction Industries Board; extending sunset date. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Laid over |
2013-04-25 | House | General Order |
2013-03-25 | House | Published on Consent Docket |
2013-03-20 | House | Emergency removed |
2013-03-20 | House | Title restored |
2013-03-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-02-25 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |