OK SB1064 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - coauthored by Yen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - coauthored by Yen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credits; modifying time period during which credits are allowed for construction of energy efficient residential construction. Effective date.
Title
Income tax credits; modifying time period during which credits are allowed for construction of energy efficient residential construction. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Casey Murdock [R] | Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] |
Sen. Rob Standridge [R] | Sen. Ervin Yen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | coauthored by Yen |
2016-02-29 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2016-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Standridge |
2016-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Murdock (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | coauthored by Shaw |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |