OK SB1062 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; creating the Oklahoma Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Professions and occupations; creating the Oklahoma Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale DeWitt [R] | Sen. David Myers [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Approved by Governor 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-06 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-05 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-05 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-14 | HAs read | |
2009-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 24 | |
2009-04-13 | General Order | |
2009-04-06 | Title restored | |
2009-04-06 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-03 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by DeWitt (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-09 | Pending authorship Representative(s) DeWitt | |
2009-02-09 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Myers | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14A | 6 | 502 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 6 | 503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2081 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2082 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2083 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2084 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2085 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2086 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2087 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2088 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2089 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2090 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2091 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2092 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2093 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2095 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |