OK SB106 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB106
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; unlawful intent; modifying penalties; modifying revocation penalty for certain unlawful act; eliminating grace period for license renewals; excluding fingerprint search requirement. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; unlawful intent; modifying penalties; modifying revocation penalty for certain unlawful act; eliminating grace period for license renewals; excluding fingerprint search requirement. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Rep. Robert Manger [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 4 |
2021-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-03-30 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative ODonnell (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB106 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021