OK SB1056 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; creating the Patient Access Task Force. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Professions and occupations; creating the Patient Access Task Force. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Title restored | |
2009-04-02 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-03-10 | First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-09 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-09 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-09 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Cox | |
2009-02-09 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |