OK SB1031 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1031
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Approved by Governor 02/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Approved by Governor 02/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; reinstating certain temporary provisions; specifying expiration of temporary provisions. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; reinstating certain temporary provisions; specifying expiration of temporary provisions. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 02/10/2021 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-02-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-02-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-02-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5 |
2021-02-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Waldron, Cruz, Virgin, Ranson, Provenzano, Bennett, Nichols, Goodwin, Brewer, Blancett, Phillips, Strom |
2021-02-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-04 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2021-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from General Government committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1031 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Approved by Governor 02/10/2021