OK SB1031 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Licensing and regulations; deleting and transferring certain duties of the Hospital Advisory Council. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing and regulations; deleting and transferring certain duties of the Hospital Advisory Council. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2019-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-25SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-02-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author)
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Kidd
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback