OK SB1026 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1026
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; Reentry Policy Council; providing sunset date. Effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; Reentry Policy Council; providing sunset date. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/21/2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 11 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 21 |
2019-04-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader |
2019-04-02 | House | General Order |
2019-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1026 (Carry Over) 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2019