OK SB1019 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1019
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacies; authorizing refills without a prescription in certain circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Pharmacies; authorizing refills without a prescription in certain circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/23/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | General Order |
2019-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Simpson |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hicks |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1019 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019