OK SB1019 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmacies; authorizing refills without a prescription in certain circumstances. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacies; authorizing refills without a prescription in certain circumstances. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateApproved by Governor 04/23/2019
2019-04-17SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-17HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-17SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-16SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-16HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-16HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2019-04-16HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-25HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-25SenateEngrossed to House
2019-02-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-02-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2019-02-21SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-02-19SenateCoauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
2019-02-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Simpson
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Hicks
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback