OK HR1023 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaiming February 8, 2018, to be Wear Red Day in Oklahoma; urging all citizens to show support by commemorating February 8, 2018, by wearing the color red.
Title
Proclaiming February 8, 2018, to be Wear Red Day in Oklahoma; urging all citizens to show support by commemorating February 8, 2018, by wearing the color red.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2018-02-08 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2018-02-08 | House | Considered |
2018-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Munson |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced |