OK HJR1117 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-07 - Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; distribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-07 Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
2012-05-08 Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2012-05-07 First Reading
2012-05-07 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-05-03 Referred for engrossment
2012-05-03 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 5
2012-05-03 Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2012-05-03 General Order
2012-04-18 CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee
2012-04-09 Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
2012-04-05 Authored by Representative Grau
2012-04-05 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback