OK HJR1056 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Coauthored by Senator Bullard
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution; Article V Convention; amendments to the U.S, Constitution and a gathering of the states in preparation for Article V Convention; termination date; filing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution; Article V Convention; amendments to the U.S, Constitution and a gathering of the states in preparation for Article V Convention; termination date; filing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2022-04-13SenateReported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
2022-03-29SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2022-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2022-03-28HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2022-03-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2022-03-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 19
2022-03-23HouseAmended by floor substitute
2022-03-23HouseAuthored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
2022-03-23HouseGeneral Order
2022-03-03HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2022-02-08HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2022-02-07HouseAuthored by Representative Lepak
2022-02-07HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback