OK HJR1056 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; creating the Save Our State Amendment; requiring the courts to uphold and adhere to federal and state law.
Title
Constitutional amendment; creating the Save Our State Amendment; requiring the courts to uphold and adhere to federal and state law.
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Brogdon [R] | Rep. Mike Christian [R] | Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] |
Rep. Rex Duncan [R] | Rep. John Enns [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Rep. Charles Key [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Mike Reynolds [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Rep. Randy Terrill [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-18 | CCR read | |
2010-05-18 | To Senate | |
2010-05-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 10 | |
2010-05-18 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-06 | Resolving clause restored | |
2010-05-06 | Title restored | |
2010-05-06 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Key | |
2010-05-06 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-05 | HC's named: Duncan, Reynolds, Terrill, Christian, Proctor, Pruett | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Sykes, Anderson, Brogdon, Crain, Corn | |
2010-04-22 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-21 | SA's received | |
2010-04-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 | |
2010-04-20 | coauthored by Brogdon | |
2010-04-20 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-20 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 | |
2010-03-10 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-10 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds, Coody, Tibbs, Derby, Kern, Terrill, Enns, Christian, Faught, Moore | |
2010-03-10 | General Order | |
2010-02-04 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-04 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Duncan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |