IA HF2698 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for veterans and health and human services, including other related provisions and appropriations including but not limited to the personal needs allowance for certain persons under Medicaid and the state supplementary assistance programs, replacement generation tax revenues, the Medicaid fraud and health care trust funds, the retention of certain revenues by the mental health institutes, the retention of Medicaid eligibility by residents of mental health institutes, the scope of services of the state resource centers, the appropriation of moneys in the juvenile detention home fund, the family investment program account and diversion program, the child support collection services center refund account, the quality assurance assessment payment period, the centers of excellence grant program, an assisted living program revised payment model study, funding for county commissions of veteran affairs, foster care provisions including those relating to a relative or fictive kin, health care employment agencies and health care technology platforms, medical cannabidiol practitioner requirements, nursing facility oversight, and state-funded psychiatry residency and fellowship positions, providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. Effective date: 05/09/2024, 07/01/2024. Applicability date: 07/01/2022, 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for veterans and health and human services, including other related provisions and appropriations including but not limited to the personal needs allowance for certain persons under Medicaid and the state supplementary assistance programs, replacement generation tax revenues, the Medicaid fraud and health care trust funds, the retention of certain revenues by the mental health institutes, the retention of Medicaid eligibility by residents of mental health institutes, the scope of services of the state resource centers, the appropriation of moneys in the juvenile detention home fund, the family investment program account and diversion program, the child support collection services center refund account, the quality assurance assessment payment period, the centers of excellence grant program, an assisted living program revised payment model study, funding for county commissions of veteran affairs, foster care provisions including those relating to a relative or fictive kin, health care employment agencies and health care technology platforms, medical cannabidiol practitioner requirements, nursing facility oversight, and state-funded psychiatry residency and fellowship positions, providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. Effective date: 05/09/2024, 07/01/2024. Applicability date: 07/01/2022, 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5218 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5217 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5216 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider 860 JOURNAL OF THE HOUSE 102nd Day amendment H–8362, to amendment H–8348? (Y: 34 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Shall amendment H–8371, to amendment H–8348, be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - House - Shall amendment H–8361, to amendment H–8348, be adopted? (Y: 39 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - House - Shall amendment H–8359, to amendment H–8348, be adopted? (Y: 39 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5218 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5217 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5216 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider 860 JOURNAL OF THE HOUSE 102nd Day amendment H–8362, to amendment H–8348? (Y: 34 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Shall amendment H–8371, to amendment H–8348, be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - House - Shall amendment H–8361, to amendment H–8348, be adopted? (Y: 39 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - House - Shall amendment H–8359, to amendment H–8348, be adopted? (Y: 39 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | House | NOBA: Final |
2024-05-09 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 940. |
2024-05-06 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 935. |
2024-04-19 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2024-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 893. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 915. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 15. S.J. 915. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5216 filed, lost. S.J. 914. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5218 filed, lost. S.J. 913. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5217 filed, lost. S.J. 912. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2437. S.J. 912. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2437. S.J. 899. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 899. |
2024-04-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 869. |
2024-04-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 870. |
2024-04-18 | House | Passed House, yeas 56, nays 35. H.J. 861. |
2024-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8348 adopted. H.J. 860. |
2024-04-18 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 860. |
2024-04-18 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-8362 to amendment H-8348, yeas 34, nays 57. H.J. 860. |
2024-04-18 | House | Point of order raised on amendment H-8362 to amendment H-8348, ruled not germane. H.J. 859. |
2024-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8362 filed. H.J. 859. |
2024-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8361 to amendment H-8348, yeas 39, nays 53, filed, lost. H.J. 858. |
2024-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8371 to amendment H-8348, yeas 35, nays 57, filed, lost. H.J. 857. |
2024-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8360 to amendment H-8348 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 857. |
2024-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8359 to amendment H-8348, yeas 39, nays 52, filed, lost. H.J. 856. |
2024-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8348 filed. H.J. 856. |
2024-04-17 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2024-04-16 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 815. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3205 (Related) 2024-04-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2437.
SF2437 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 915.
SF2437 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 915.