LA SB205 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date 5/28/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date 5/28/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires additional compensation for teachers and other school employees under certain circumstances. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Requires additional compensation for teachers and other school employees under certain circumstances. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 205 FINAL PASSAGE (#1297) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 205 FINAL PASSAGE (#485) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 205 FINAL PASSAGE (#485) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | Effective date 5/28/2024. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 311. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/23/2024. |
2024-05-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2024-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2024. |
2024-05-20 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-15 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re-reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |