OK HJR1020 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR1020
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; modifying legislative term limits; ballot title; filing.
Title
Constitutional amendment; modifying legislative term limits; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McDugle |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HJR1020 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)