OK HB4460 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grand River Dam Authority; bonding authority; increasing allowed level under certain condition.
Title
Grand River Dam Authority; bonding authority; increasing allowed level under certain condition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2022-05-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-05-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-05-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 14 |
2022-05-18 | House | JCR adopted |
2022-05-18 | House | General Order |
2022-05-17 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-16 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-15 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall |
2022-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2022-02-15 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez |
2022-02-15 | House | First Reading |