OK HB4327 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abortion; prohibiting performance of abortion except under certain conditions; requiring test to meet specified criteria; physician records; civil action; prohibiting certain transfer of venue; emergency.
Title
Abortion; prohibiting performance of abortion except under certain conditions; requiring test to meet specified criteria; physician records; civil action; prohibiting certain transfer of venue; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: SUSPEND RULE (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: SUSPEND RULE (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 05/25/2022 |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 16 |
2022-05-19 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson |
2022-05-19 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-05-02 | House | SA's received |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David, Garvin, Hall, Jech, Kidd, Leewright, Murdock, Pemberton, Rader, Rosino, Simpson, Standridge, Stanley, Stephens, Taylor, Weaver |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Daniels |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2022-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 19 |
2022-03-22 | House | Emergency added |
2022-03-22 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2022-03-22 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Stearman |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |