OK HB4118 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; physical therapist continuing education; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; physical therapist continuing education; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 17 |
2020-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |