OK HB4086 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Emergency removed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Emergency removed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Wildlife; requiring the Oklahoma Department of Wildlife Conservation to produce study on elk population; effective date.
Title
Wildlife; requiring the Oklahoma Department of Wildlife Conservation to produce study on elk population; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Green; authored by Senator Bullard |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2024-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-04 | House | Emergency added |
2024-03-04 | House | Amended |
2024-03-04 | House | General Order |
2024-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Green (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |