OK HB4082 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Vetoed 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Vetoed 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health; creating Mental Health Transport Revolving Fund; law enforcement responsibility for transporting persons for mental health services; effective date.
Title
Mental health; creating Mental Health Transport Revolving Fund; law enforcement responsibility for transporting persons for mental health services; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | House | Vetoed 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-12 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-12 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3 |
2022-05-12 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-15 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2022-02-10 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |