OK HB3976 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide accessibility signage; physically disabled parking and access signage; requiring signage changes; effective date.
Title
Statewide accessibility signage; physically disabled parking and access signage; requiring signage changes; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Merleyn Bell [D] | Sen. Mary Boren [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: State Powers Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: State Powers Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Boren (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute State Powers Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to State Powers |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Bell |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |