OK HB3973 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Trusts; creating the Task Force on Trust Administration Review and Reform; effective date.
Title
Trusts; creating the Task Force on Trust Administration Review and Reform; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 13 |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-28 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |