OK HB3898 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Waters and water rights; Grand River Dam Authority; domicile; revenue bond authorization limit; effective date.
Title
Waters and water rights; Grand River Dam Authority; domicile; revenue bond authorization limit; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |