OK HB3808 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Child care; requiring payment of Child Care Provider Contract on weekly basis; payment based on enrollment; rate; loss of benefit; annual market rate survey; effective date; emergency.
Title
Child care; requiring payment of Child Care Provider Contract on weekly basis; payment based on enrollment; rate; loss of benefit; annual market rate survey; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Emergency added |
2020-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hasenbeck |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |