OK HB3686 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Child welfare; requiring person reporting child abuse or neglect to disclose name, telephone number and address; effective date.
Title
Child welfare; requiring person reporting child abuse or neglect to disclose name, telephone number and address; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 47 |
2018-03-15 | House | Amended |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Calvey |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |