OK HB3661 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; clarifying eligibility requirements for commutation applicants; emergency.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; clarifying eligibility requirements for commutation applicants; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 4 |
2020-03-05 | House | Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-05 | House | General Order |
2020-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |