OK HB3658 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher certification; Oklahoma Teacher Preparation Act; removing requirement to pass the general education portion of the competency examination; emergency.
Title
Teacher certification; Oklahoma Teacher Preparation Act; removing requirement to pass the general education portion of the competency examination; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Sterling [R] | Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R] | Rep. Logan Phillips [R] | Rep. Randy Randleman [R] |
Rep. John Talley [R] | Sen. Carri Hicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Approved by Governor 05/05/2022 |
2022-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hicks |
2022-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, Talley, Randleman |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-02-17 | House | Emergency added |
2022-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2022-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Sterling |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |