OK HB3636 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Waters and water rights; creating the Oklahoma Water Economic Impact Study Act; creating the Oklahoma Water Economic Impact Study Fund; stating sources of revenue; conducting instream flow studies on certain bodies of water; effective date; emergency.
Title
Waters and water rights; creating the Oklahoma Water Economic Impact Study Act; creating the Oklahoma Water Economic Impact Study Fund; stating sources of revenue; conducting instream flow studies on certain bodies of water; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Emergency added |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2022-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3 |
2022-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey |
2022-03-07 | House | General Order |
2022-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2022-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Dempsey |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |