OK HB3571 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; bond authorization; Jim Thorpe Office Building; emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; bond authorization; Jim Thorpe Office Building; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House: ADOPT SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 77 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 05/25/2022 |
2022-05-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-18 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 6 |
2022-05-18 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-05-02 | House | SA's received |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 9 |
2022-03-21 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-21 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-03-21 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-03-21 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |