OK HB3546 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State government; legal representation of agency; prohibiting certain attorneys from being voting members of boards or commissions; effective date.
Title
State government; legal representation of agency; prohibiting certain attorneys from being voting members of boards or commissions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | Amended |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |