OK HB3540 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Vetoed 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Vetoed 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Physician assistants; death certificates; signatures; effective date.
Title
Physician assistants; death certificates; signatures; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | Vetoed 05/03/2022 |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-28 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |