OK HB3532 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; tobacco products; definitions; stamps; excise taxation; penalties; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; tobacco products; definitions; stamps; excise taxation; penalties; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2020-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire, Hilbert |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |