OK HB3502 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring compulsory school attendance for certain students who are eighteen; punishment for violations; emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring compulsory school attendance for certain students who are eighteen; punishment for violations; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Hardin (David) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |