OK HB3467 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; appointment of counsel; reimbursement; effective date.
Title
Children; appointment of counsel; reimbursement; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-10 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |