OK HB3418 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy; sale, manufacturing or packaging of dangerous drugs; licensure exceptions; effective date.
Title
Pharmacy; sale, manufacturing or packaging of dangerous drugs; licensure exceptions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Scott |
2020-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |