OK HB3416 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; removing limitation of applicability of the Limitation of Liability for Farming and Ranching Land Act.
Title
Agriculture; removing limitation of applicability of the Limitation of Liability for Farming and Ranching Land Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 04/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-06 | House | General Order |
2018-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |